1Question

Get 1Q Pro with access to all premium features FREE. Find out more!

Multiply Using Partial Products micro-lesson

Do you struggle with balancing your kids’ screen time with their education? Say hello to 1Question, the app that solves this problem with a fun twist! Our app lets your child earn screen time minutes in their favourite apps by watching educational videos and correctly answering quiz questions. And the best part? You get to decide which apps to lock behind learning using 1Question. 

Learning time​

Kids learn by watching short, engaging video lessons.

When you multiply two digits by two digits, you might want to try the partial product method. Let's take 85 x 29. We’ll first look at this 9 in the ones place. We're going to multiply it twice, 9 x 5 is 45 and 9 x 80 is 720. Now, if I look at the 2, and I realize the two is in the tens place so it's worth 20. So, I'm going to multiply by 20, 20 x 5 is 100 and 20 x 80 is 1,600. Our final step is to add up all of the partial products 45 + 720 + 120 and 1,600 gives us 2,465 for our final product of 85 x 29. The partial product strategy is another great method for multiplying two digits by two digits.

Examples of 1Question Maths Questions

Answer time

Kids earn more screen time by answering fun educational questions.

Here are some example of questions about this video that kids may be asked in the 1Question app to earn screen time.

  • How much is the 2 worth in the problem 85 x 29?

    1) 20
    2) 2
    3) 200
    4) 2000
  • How many partial products will you have for 85 x 29?

    1) 4
    2) 3
    3) 2
    4) 1
  • How many partial products will you have for 27 x 48?

    1) 4
    2) 3
    3) 2
    4) 1
  • How many partial products will 95 x 3 have?

    1) 2
    2) 3
    3) 4
    4) 5
  • How many partial products will 56 x 7 have?

    1) 2
    2) 3
    3) 4
    4) 5
  • Use two partial products to solve 56 x 7.

    1) 392
    2) 77
    3) 239
    4) 342
  • How much is the 9 worth in the problem 85 x 29?

    1) 9
    2) 90
    3) 900
    4) 9000
  • Use the partial product method to solve 84 x 2.

    1) 168
    2) 160
    3) 640
    4) 174
  • The partial products for 25 x 13 are 200, 60, 50, and 15. What is the final product?

    1) 325
    2) 265
    3) 310
    4) 350
  • Use the partial product method to solve 65 x 7.

    1) 455
    2) 420
    3) 95
    4) 425
  • Use the partial product strategy to solve 39 x 15.

    1) 585
    2) 485
    3) 72
    4) 288
  • What is the final product for 85 x 29?

    1) 2465
    2) 2546
    3) 2645
    4) 2564
  • Use the partial product method to solve 91 x 43.

    1) 3913
    2) 3600
    3) 3870
    4) 4050
  • Use the partial product strategy to solve 82 x 63.

    1) 5166
    2) 4800
    3) 5009
    4) 5100
  • A farmer has 57 cows. Each cow produces 28 liters of milk. How many liters of milk do the cows produce in all?

    1) 1,596 liters of milk
    2) 210 liters of milk
    3) 696 liters of milk
    4) 120 liters of milk
  • What are the partial products for 95 x 3?

    1) 270 + 15
    2) 27 + 15
    3) 270 + 150
    4) 2,700 + 15
  • Which of these shows the correct partial products for this problem?

    1) 3,600 + 40 + 270 + 3
    2) 30 + 40 + 27 + 360
    3) 30 + 270 + 4 + 3,600
    4) 3,600 + 40 + 27 + 30
  • What are the four partial products you should add together to find the total product for this problem?

    1) Any of the above will work.
    2) 6 + 240 +120 + 4,800
    3) 240 + 120 + 4,800 + 6
    4) 4,800 +120 + 6 + 240
  • Emma says the partial products for 84 x 2 are 8 and 16. What did she do wrong?

    1) She multiplied 2 x 8 instead of 2 x 80.
    2) She added 2 + 80 instead of multiplying 2 x 80.
    3) She multiplied 2 x 8 instead of adding 2 + 8.
    4) She added 2 + 4 instead of multiplying 4 x 2.
  • Lola says the partial productsmay be added in any order. Is she correct?

    1) Yes
    2) No
  • Brad says the partial products for 57 x 31 are 7, 50, 210, and 1,500. Is he correct?

    1) Yes
    2) No
  • Elsa says the partial products for 23 x 92 are 6, 4, 27, and 18. Is she correct?

    1) No
    2) Yes
  • It is critical to line up your place values as your write down your partial products/

    1) TRUE
    2) FALSE
  • The 6 in 65 x 7 is worth 60.

    1) TRUE
    2) FALSE

Recreational screen time

Kids can use the screen time minutes they earned to unlock the apps selected by their parent e.g. games, social media, streaming, etc.

Out of time

When screen time minutes run out, kids are locked out and need to complete more learning in 1Question to earn more time.

Meet your educator

Our micro-courses are developed and delivered by qualified educators from around the world.

Chris Lindsey

Chris Lindsey

More lessons from the Master Multiplication micro-course

When you multiply with multiples of 10, remember, it’s all about the facts. For example,…

When solving multiplication word problems, here’s a few strategies you can use. Sal earns $12…

What’s the difference between prime and composite numbers? Here is a list of the first…

When we talk about the area of a rectangle, we’re talking about measuring the space…

Sometimes when you’re doing word problems, they require more than one step. Two classes of…

If you want to multiply with 2- or 3-digit numbers, you should use area models….

When you multiply 2 numbers, sometimes you don’t want an exact answer. You want an…

Sometimes numbers follow a pattern and we need to figure out what the rule is…

Factors are the numbers you multiply together to find a product. Every number has at…

Area models are a great way to solve multiplication problems. With larger numbers, you’re going…

Did you know that you can find multiples by using skip counting? If you skip…